Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the Board of Electricians; authorizing the Board to issue an apprentice license and a journeyperson license; authorizing the Board to adopt a State electrical code; altering duties and membership of the Board; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a specified local electrical code; establishing a licensing exception for a person that provides limited energy services or that is licensed or registered to provide security systems services; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0877 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-101 through 6-103, 6-201 through 6-205, 6-206, 6-207, 6-208, 6-301 through 6-503, 6-320 through 6-602, 6-504, 6-505, 6-506, 6-601, 6-602, 6-603, 6-604, 6-605, 6-605 through 6-610, 6-606, 6-701, 6-702 )
(   2-106.10, 2-106.9 )
(   12-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM