Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Conway, Edwards, Feldman, Gladden, Guzzone, Hough, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Miller, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to proclaim annually the second week in June as Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and environmental organizations, including the Chesapeake Bay Foundation, the Alliance for the Chesapeake Bay, the Choose Clean Water Coalition, and the Chesapeake Bay Commercial Fishermen's Association, to properly observe Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week with specified events, activities, and programs.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1319
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406981/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-3)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {406981/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-3) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM