Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a special event permit in Washington County; authorizing a holder of a Class 3 wintery license or a Class 4 limited winery license in the county to sell beer, wine produced by the holder, and liquor for on-premises consumption at specified events; requiring the permit holder, before using the permit, to notify the Board of License Commissioners at least 1 week before an event is to occur; authorizing the license holder to use the permit no more than 60 times in a year; and providing an annual permit fee of $1,000.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sales at Winery Special Events
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments {704138/1 Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Referred Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-102, 31-401, 31-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM