Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Former Baltimore City Jail Employees
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that certain former Baltimore City Jail employees who are members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System and who meet certain criteria may receive a normal service retirement allowance that is based on certain service; and requiring the State Retirement Agency, on or before October 1, 2018, to notify certain individuals affected by the Act of their rights to apply certain service credit to the Correctional Officers' Retirement System.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Former Baltimore City Jail Employees
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM