Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh (Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully possessing, obtaining, or helping another to possess or obtain personal identifying information with fraudulent intent to access health information or health care; prohibiting a person from using a specified device knowingly, willfully, and with fraudulent intent to access health information or health care; providing penalties for a violation; authorizing a court to order restitution; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0942
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {668472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {522819/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {668472/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {522819/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM