Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Benson, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, Muse, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, Zucker, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Ramirez, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the surviving spouse of a deceased disabled veteran be at least 65 years old to qualify for a certain exemption to vehicle registration fees.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1162
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {798372/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 45
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 69
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM