Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Needs and Expenditures of State Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Colburn, Currie, Forehand, Klausmeier, Montgomery, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Needs and Expenditures of State Programs; establishing the membership and staff of the Task Force; requiring the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House to designate the chair of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to examine and make findings and recommendations on specified issues related to the needs and expenditures of State programs; requiring the Task Force to submit specified reports by specified dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1190 Session: 2008 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM