Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and Benson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under certain circumstances or to possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under certain circumstances; requiring certain offenders to be issued a citation under certain circumstances; providing a certain maximum fine of $100; providing that a person may prepay a citation issued for a violation under a certain provision of the Act; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118277/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters and Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {118277/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means 43
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters and Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-321, 6-322 )
(   10-119, 12-102, 12-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM