Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Brain Injury Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Senators King, Astle, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Ramirez, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the State Brain Injury Trust Fund as a special fund used to support specified services for individuals with brain injuries; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene or the Secretary's designee to administer the Fund; requiring the Secretary or the Secretary's designee to make specified reports; establishing eligibility for individuals to receive assistance from the Fund; requiring that specified investment earnings be credited to the Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0061
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {267975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756487/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {267975/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {756487/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-21A-01 through 13-21A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM