Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, DeGrange, Glassman, Kittleman, Klausmeier, and Robey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified notice procedures required to enforce a lien on specified property stored in a leased space at a self-service storage facility; providing that a specified sale held on an online auction Web site to enforce a specified lien shall be deemed to be held at a specified location; altering the required means of delivery of specified notices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187973/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187973/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863396/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {187973/1 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Laid Over (Senator Frosh) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {187973/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 45
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Astle) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 49
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {863396/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-501, 18-503, 18-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM