Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Alternative Teacher Certification Program
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Education, the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, and at least two local education agencies to consider and, if appropriate, develop an alternative teacher certification program for areas of the State experiencing a critical teacher shortage; requiring the State Board of Education, the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, and specified local education agencies to consider specified criteria in the development of an alternative teacher certification program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0790
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284133/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {284133/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM