Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from a specified offset of a retirement allowance specified retirees of the Teachers' Retirement System or the Teachers' Pension System who are employed in specified positions in a local school system or the Maryland School for the Deaf; authorizing local school system superintendents and the superintendent of the Maryland School for the Deaf to employ a maximum of five retirees per year who will not be subject to a specified offset of a retirement allowance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159530/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {159530/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Appropriations 49
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM