Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $250,000 to $500,000 the aggregate amount of State income tax credits the Department of Housing and Community Development is authorized to issue in a taxable year for donations to specified qualified permanent endowment funds at specified community foundations; and applying the Act to taxable years 2018 and beyond.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {729136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {729136/1 Adopted 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland - Credit Amounts
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM