Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Check - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings and Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to accept a background check from an armored car company in place of a criminal history records check performed by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1300
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM