Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, Eckardt, Edwards, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; and making the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0856
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0014 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869830/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {869830/1 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Committee Amendment Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM