Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Benson, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a specified local telephone company provide "lifeline" to qualifying low-income consumers under specified circumstances; repealing a requirement that a telephone company charge an eligible subscriber a percentage of a specified tariff under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Human Resources to provide specified information to local telephone companies to the extent allowed by State law in addition to federal law and until specified eligibility is determined; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0999
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {807274/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 54
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Telephone Lifeline Service - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM