Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a certain share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will; providing that a surviving spouse may take a certain elective share amount of a certain estate subject to election; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a certain elective share amount is payable; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0777
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {788977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {788977/1 Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-204, 14.5-605, 17-202, 17-203, 2-102, 3-201, 3-203 through 3-208, 3-401 through 3-413, 7-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page