Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Benson, Brochin, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State a certain expanded polystyrene food service product on or after January 1, 2019; prohibiting certain food service businesses and certain schools from selling or providing food in certain expanded polystyrene food service products on or after January 1, 2019; requiring a county health department to impose certain penalties for violations of the Act; requiring a county health department to notify the Department of the Environment of certain violations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0538
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0186 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2201 through 9-2207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM