Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards and requirements for the required warning period for violations recorded by speed monitoring systems; establishing that speed monitoring systems placed in specified areas may be placed only on highways with a specified minimum speed limit; applying notice and signage standards for unmanned local stationary speed monitoring systems to all local speed monitoring systems; requiring local jurisdictions to designate specified persons to act in a liaison capacity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0929
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM