Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Mass Transit
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Brinkley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the sales and use tax rate on a sale in counties with specified services by a specified amount; creating the Mass Transit Account in the Transportation Trust Fund to pay for the costs of light rail and Metro subway transit facilities and transit service in specified counties; requiring that revenue from the increase in the sales and use tax rate under the Act be credited to the Mass Transit Account; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0589 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Mass Transit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104, 11-301, 2-1302.2, 2-1303 )
(   3-216, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM