Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a member of the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board may petition the circuit court to order the State, a president, a system institution, or a person to comply with an order from the Board; and establishing that the failure to meet an established negotiation deadline is an unfair labor practice for certain entities under certain conditions.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0451
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {257278/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-11)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {257278/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-11) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-2A-09, 3-306, 3-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM