Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Tip Credit - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Lee, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of an employer to include as part of an employee's wage an amount to represent the tips of the employee.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM