Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the portion of motor fuel tax revenue that is distributed to a specified account that is shared with Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; increasing the portion of highway user revenue that is shared with Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; altering the allocation of the local portion of highway user revenues among Baltimore City, the counties, and municipalities; requiring that a specified additional grant be made to municipalities for transportation purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1067
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1103 )
(   8-402, 8-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM