Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Ready, and Serafini
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain law enforcement unit to sell, exchange, or transfer certain forfeited firearms to a federally licensed firearms dealer under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1146
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0604 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798979/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {798979/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page