Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Shank, Madaleno, Colburn, Jones-Rodwell, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the positions eligible for membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include security chief, facility administrator, assistant warden, and warden; authorizing specified individuals to cease membership in the Employees' Pension System and enroll in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; authorizing specified individuals to transfer service credit from the Employees' Pension System to the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0708
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {939038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {939038/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM