Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a petition signature page to contain a specified notification and be completed on a specified form; altering the information an individual must provide to sign a petition; establishing specified requirements for an online petition system; establishing specified requirements for petition circulators; requiring that a specified determination of whether a petition has a sufficient number of signatures be made in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Referendum Integrity Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-202, 13-208, 13-245.1, 13-309, 13-310.1, 16-401, 3-502, 6-103, 6-201, 6-203, 6-204, 6-206, 6-208, 7-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM