Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near Buildings
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified person from discharging a firearm within 150 yards of a dwelling house, residence, church, or specified other buildings in Calvert County under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM