Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Contracts and Policies - Educational and Promotional Materials and Articles of Merchandise
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $50 the maximum cost of educational and promotional materials and articles of merchandise that a person may offer, promise, or give as valuable consideration not specified in a contract of life insurance or health insurance or in an annuity contract; prohibiting a person from making receipt of any educational materials, promotional materials, or articles of merchandise under certain provisions of law contingent on the sale or purchase of insurance; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Contracts and Policies - Educational and Promotional Materials and Articles of Merchandise
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {637179/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Contracts and Policies - Educational and Promotional Materials and Articles of Merchandise
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Economic Matters 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Contracts and Policies - Educational and Promotional Materials and Articles of Merchandise
(   27-209, 27-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page