Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the intent of the General Assembly to enforce the right of every adult in the State to visit with and receive certain communication from whomever the adult chooses, with a certain exception; establishing a rebuttable presumption in an action under the Act; authorizing a certain person to petition a certain court for reasonable visitation with a certain alleged incapacitated or protected person; requiring the petition to be verified and to state certain facts; providing for service of process; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0864
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM