Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Conway, Eckardt, Ferguson, Gladden, Mathias, McFadden, and Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the amount of a credit allowed against the State income tax is 75%, not to exceed $500,000, of the investment in qualified Maryland biotechnology companies located in Allegany, Dorchester, Garrett, or Somerset counties or Baltimore City; applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1167
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-725 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM