Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Waldstreicher, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Jennings, King, Kramer, Lee, Patterson, Reilly, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of the Division of Correction to operate a comprehensive rehabilitative prerelease facility for female inmates; requiring that a certain prerelease facility be located in an area, defined by the zip codes where the largest percentage of inmates will likely be released; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to complete certain phases of a certain project by certain dates; requiring the Commissioner to provide evidence-based and gender-responsive prerelease services certain inmates; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568676/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-27)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) Withdrawn 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (104-27) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9 (Senator King) Adopted
Last Updated: 1/25/2021 4:41 PM
Click to return on the top page