Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the juvenile court to determine whether a local department made a reasonable effort, for a child at least 18 years of age, to enroll the child in health insurance that will continue after the child is emancipated, screen and assist the child with eligibility for public assistance, and establish a plan for stable housing for at least 12 months and sufficient income after emancipation; requiring a local department to advise a child before emancipation of the right to reenter care and procedures for reentering care; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0439
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138772/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {138772/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary 43A
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-525 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM