Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Information Sharing (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a purpose of the 9-1-1 emergency telephone system is to establish a specified mechanism for the Emergency Number Systems Board to review specified data; expanding the purpose of the Board to include review of specified data contained in specified reports; requiring the Board to include a general summary of findings from a review of specified reports in an annual report submitted to specified entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 1-301, 1-302, 1-306, 1-307, 1-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM