Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Gallery Beer and Wine License
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue an art gallery beer and wine license to nonprofit and for-profit retail businesses that display and sell original artwork, or copies of original artwork that are produced no more than 300 times, by an individual or a group of artists; specifying that a holder of the license may sell or serve beer and wine at retail for on-premises consumption when snacks are served during specified hours; specifying a $100 annual license fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0842
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894933/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Waugh) {463225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743794/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Barkley) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {894933/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Waugh) {463225/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {743794/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM