Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, with specified exceptions, the attachment points above which a medical stop-loss insurer assumes liability for losses incurred by an insured; applying the altered attachment points to renewal of a policy or contract of medical stop-loss insurance; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a study of the use of medical stop-loss insurance in self-funded employer health plans and submit specified reports to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before specified dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647775/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647775/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {413621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {647775/1 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 59
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {647775/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {413621/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 62
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-129 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM