Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program to provide funds to local jurisdictions to establish and expand community behavioral health crisis response systems; requiring that, for certain fiscal years, the Governor include in the budget bill certain appropriations for the Program; authorizing certain uses of funds distributed under the Program; requiring the Department of Health, by December 1 each year beginning in 2020, to report to the Governor and the General Assembly certain data regarding the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {317974/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {317974/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296783/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {317974/1 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {317974/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 43A
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {296783/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM