Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Charter School Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Eckardt, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Public Charter School Authority as a public chartering authority under the Maryland Public Charter School Program; specifying that employees of a public charter school authorized by the Authority are not public school employees, are exempt from State teacher certification requirements, and may refuse to join employee organizations; requiring the Authority to adopt specified policies regarding teacher induction, preparation, and development; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0878
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Charter School Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Charter School Act of 2017
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 9-101, 9-102, 9-102.1, 9-102.2, 9-102.3, 9-103, 9-103.1, 9-104, 9-104.1, 9-105 through 9-111, 9-105.1, 9-106.1, 9-107.1, 9-112 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:44 PM