Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Eckardt, Guzzone, Mathias, Middleton, Peters, Rosapepe, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to include psychiatrists who are providing Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in the types of providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Program recipients; requiring the Department to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on general fund expenditures for certain reimbursements by September 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {897078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {476880/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {897078/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 41
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {476880/1 Adopted 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61A
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM