Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Madaleno, Manno, Pinsky, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to require a specified applicant to conduct and submit to the Department a cumulative impact assessment before the Department prepares a tentative determination on a specified permit application; requiring a cumulative impact assessment to address the likely impact on the environment and on human populations that will result from specified incremental impacts; authorizing the Department to adopt regulations necessary to implement the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234936/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {234936/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 51
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-604, 1-901 through 1-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM