Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing the Comptroller to specify, by regulation, the dates on which alcoholic beverage manufacturers or wholesalers with specified sales, deliveries, or transfers of specified alcoholic beverages must file an alcoholic beverage tax return; and requiring that any filing date established by the Comptroller must be a least 5 days later than a specified day specified for filing an alcoholic beverage tax return.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609932/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {609932/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 49
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM