Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Forehand, Garagiola, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program and Fund; specifying the purposes of the Program and the Fund; requiring the Maryland Biotechnology Center in the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; establishing criteria and award amounts for grants awarded under the Program; requiring recipients of Program funds to pay a royalty; requiring the Governor to make a specified appropriation beginning in fiscal year 2015; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0948
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-7)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {207274/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-7) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations 55A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1401 through 5-1406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM