Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified Executive Branch agencies and the Department of Legislative Services to prepare economic impact analyses for specified bills that impact local government land use decisions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0989
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1505.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM