Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Elfreth, Guzzone, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing procedures and requirements for the permitting, installation, and regulation of certain wireless telecommunications facilities in the State; authorizing a wireless provider to install and maintain certain facilities in certain rights-of-way in accordance with certain provisions; prohibiting the use of a public right-of-way from obstructing or hindering certain other uses; prohibiting a certain local law from prohibiting the installation of certain facilities or discriminating among certain providers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred to interim study by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Referred to interim study by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-201, 8-701 through 8-719 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM