Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Astle, Bates, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Lee, Montgomery, Muse, Norman, and Ready
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a police officer at a motor vehicle checkpoint from targeting only motorcycles for inspection or evaluation; creating a specified exception to the prohibition for a police officer at a motor vehicle checkpoint established as part of a police search or investigation; providing for the construction of a provision of law governing obedience to a lawful order or direction of a police officer; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0917
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0640 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/26/2015 3/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-103, 25-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM