Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified commanding officer to designate to the Sheriff of Cecil County up to 20 individuals who are members of fire or ambulance companies to serve as fire police in Cecil County; authorizing the Sheriff of Cecil County to appoint specified individuals to serve as fire police in Cecil County; providing that specified powers are granted to individuals appointed to serve as fire police in Cecil County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0246
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Judiciary 46
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302, 7-303, 7-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM