Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development, by October 1, 2018, to adopt by regulation a specified statewide building code relating to specified buildings constructed with or being constructed by specified light frame combustible construction; establishing requirements for the construction of specified buildings; prohibiting a specified construction project using a specified type of construction from proceeding unless a specified fire watch warden is present; establishing qualifications and responsibilities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1311
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1201 through 12-1206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM