Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the procedures a council of unit owners or a board of directors of a condominium shall take before a penalty for a violation of the condominium's rules can be imposed on an alleged violator; establishing procedures a board of directors or other governing body of a homeowners association shall take before a penalty for a violation of the homeowners association's rules can be imposed on an alleged violator; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not apply to certain associations; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0392
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0931 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-113, 11B-111.8 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM