Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a new article to the Annotated Code of Maryland, to be designated and known as the "Alcoholic Beverages Article", to revise, restate, and recodify the laws of the State relating to the regulation and control of the manufacture, sale, distribution, transportation, and storage of alcoholic beverages by the State and specified jurisdictions in the State, the establishment of boards of license commissioners in specified jurisdictions, and the establishment of liquor control boards and departments of liquor control; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 39
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 52
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101 through 33-2802, 24-202, 24-203, 24-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM