Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting specified cross-references to the Alcoholic Beverages Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; and correcting specified errors in the Alcoholic Beverages Article.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634232/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913094/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {634232/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 39
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {913094/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-302.1, 16-2004, 21-1304, 21-1310, 2-131, 21-903, 21-905, 23-1404, 23-1406, 23-1407, 23-1703, 23-2602, 4-105, 4-109 )
(   10-1201 )
(   10-114, 10-118, 10-119, 10-121, 10-125 )
(   16-207 )
(   2-401, 27-801 )
(   18-203, 5-105 )
(   11-116 )
(   14-123, 14-124, 14-125, 14-125.1 )
(   12-101, 9-1A-24, 9-1A-37 )
(   10-735, 11-101, 13-834, 13-841, 5-301, 5-302 )
(   21-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM