Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Cassilly, and Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Training Commission to require a specified statement condemning motorcycle profiling to be included in existing written policies regarding other profiling; requiring the Commission to include in specified curriculum and courses of study training on motorcycle profiling in conjunction with existing training regarding other profiling; and defining the term "motorcycle profiling".
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0918
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268179/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {268179/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201, 3-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM